Juul Labs Inc. v. Murshed
Plaintiff: Juul Labs Inc.
Defendant: Salam Murshed
Case Number: 1:2020cv00868
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 10/15/2020. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 10/15/2020 filed by Juul Labs Inc..(Parker, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Salam Murshed by Juul Labs Inc.. Served/Mailed on 8/25/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parker, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (ed)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to Salam Murshed. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 14, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-868-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs Inc. disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Parker, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Juul Labs Inc.(Parker, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2014330 filed by Juul Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Registration Certificates, #2 Exhibit B- Product Purchased on 8/12/2019, #3 Exhibit C- Products Purchased on 8/22/2019, #4 Exhibit D- Cease-and-Desist Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E- Products Purchased on 10/30/2019, #6 Exhibit F- Products Obtained on 2/21/2020, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs Inc. v. Murshed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs Inc.
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salam Murshed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?