Rivera v. Ryall et al
Plaintiff: Felix Dominguez Rivera
Defendant: Ian Connors, FNU D. Ryall, FNU K. Hampton, FCI Fort Dix and David Paul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00918
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies hand delivered to the United States Attorney's Office, Civil Process Clerk, and via certified mail, return receipt requested to the Attorney General of the United States and Robert Hazelwood, Warden, FCI Berlin per #6 Order Directing Service.(jb)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Clerk to deliver copy of petition and this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire as outlined, and send copies by certified mail to Robert Hazelwood, Warden, FCI Berlin and the Attorney General of the United States. Respondent shall file an answer or motion to dismiss within sixty days as outlined, and motion for summary judgment or statement within sixty days of answer as outlined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion/Request for Refund. Text of Order: Felix Rivera has filed a motion (Doc. No. #5 ) asking the court to construe his initial filing (Doc. No. #1 ) in this case as a petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, rather than as a civil rights action. Upon review, the court finds that Mr. Rivera's filing is appropriately construed under 2241. Accordingly, the motion (Doc. No. #5 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk's office is directed: 1) to amend the docket to indicate that this matter is a 2241 action; and 2) to refund to Mr. Rivera all money he has paid toward the filing fee in this case in excess of the $5.00 filing fee applicable in habeas actions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/Request for Refund filed by Felix Dominguez Rivera.(jb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #4 MOTION Request to Reduce Initial $73.50 Filing Fee to Standard In Forma Pauperis Fee Amount. Text of Order: Plaintiff Felix Dominguez Rivera has filed a motion (Doc. No. #4 ) seeking the return to his prison account of $73.00 that he asserts was paid to the court from his inmate account in addition to the $73.50 initial filing fee assessed on September 1, 2020. See Doc. No. #3 . On September 25, 2020, the court received a payment of $73.50, which is the initial filing fee in this case. No other payments have been received by the court to date. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
September 29, 2020 Initial Filing Fee paid: $ 73.50 (Check), receipt number 14649019762 by Felix Dominguez Rivera re: #3 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Follow up on payment with Inmate Accounts 1/27/2021. (ed)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Request to Reduce Initial $73.50 Filing Fee to Standard In Forma Pauperis Fee Amount filed by Felix Dominguez Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb) Modified on 9/25/2020 to correct Initial text (jb).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting: #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as to Felix Dominguez Rivera, initial fee of $73.50. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to the plaintiff's account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. Finance Follow Up Deadline 11/2/2020. (ed)
September 1, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 31, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-918-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Felix Dominguez Rivera. (ed)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ian Connors, FCI Fort Dix, FNU K. Hampton, David Paul, FNU D. Ryall with Jury Demand filed by Felix Dominguez Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope) (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Ryall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU D. Ryall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU K. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Fort Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Dominguez Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?