Stuart et al v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Stuart, Jr. and Lisa Stuart
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., MMG Insurance Company and Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00962
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement by MMG Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Friedman, Christine)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 MMG ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by MMG Insurance Company.(Friedman, Christine)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. Defendant, Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Landry, Ryan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, with jury demand Allmerica Finanical Benefit Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company.(Landry, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Johnson on behalf of Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company Appearance of Counsel Attorney Michael P. Johnson added to party Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Johnson, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Denis Landry on behalf of Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company Appearance of Counsel (Landry, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company Waiver of Service of Summons by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. Attorney Ryan Denis Landry added to party Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 10/29/2020. Answer Follow Up on 12/31/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Landry, Ryan)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company filed by Richard Stuart, Jr, Lisa Stuart. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Summons - Waiver Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Taylor, R.)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Lisa Stuart, Richard Stuart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons)(Taylor, R.)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2020.(gla)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MMG Insurance Company by MMG Insurance Company. Attorney Christine Friedman added to party MMG Insurance Company(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 9/23/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Friedman, Christine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to MMG Insurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
September 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-962-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2027327 filed by Richard Stuart, Jr, Lisa Stuart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of lawsuit, #3 Notice of lawsuit, #4 Summons - Waiver, #5 Summons - Waiver)(Taylor, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuart et al v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stuart, Jr.
Represented By: R. Peter Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stuart
Represented By: R. Peter Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMG Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Denis Landry
Represented By: Michael P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?