Young v. Mayor, Portsmouth, City of
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Mayor, Portsmouth, City of
Case Number: 1:2020cv01080
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
2 Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #7 Order on Report and Recommendation, Order on Motion for a Speedy Hearing, Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Order on Pro Se Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (lw)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ///ORDER approving #5 Report and Recommendation; denying #2 Motion for a Speedy Hearing; denying as moot #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; denying as moot #4 Pro Se Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
November 13, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Reason for Reassignment: Chief Judge McCafferty Recused. The new case designation is: 20-cv-1080-SM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (js)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty recused - I hereby recuse myself from presiding over this case. The case shall be assigned to another judge. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Hearing, #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, #4 Pro Se Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing recommending the district judge dismiss all of the claims in this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, deny the request for a preliminary injunction, and deny the pending motions (Doc. Nos. 2, 3, 4) as moot. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 11/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #1 Complaint. Text of Order: The magistrate judge is designated to consider the request for a preliminary injunction set forth in the complaint (Doc. No. 1) and, if necessary, to conduct a hearing on the matter. The magistrate judge shall file proposed findings and recommendations with the court. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
November 6, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
November 2, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-1080-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Se Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (ed)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2) (ed)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for a Speedy Hearing filed by Huguette Nicole Young. HEARING REQUESTED. (ed)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Emergency Injunctive Relief against Mayor, Portsmouth, City of filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Process Receipt and Return, #4 Envelope) (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Mayor, Portsmouth, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor, Portsmouth, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?