MWH Holdings, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Plaintiff: MWH Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Certain Underwiters at Lloyd's and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Case Number: 1:2020cv01152
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL VIDEO-CONFERENCE held on 1/28/2021. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: William E. Aivalikles) (Defts Atty: Michael Savett, Brian Andrew Suslak)(Total Hearing Time: 18 minutes) (jb)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #9 Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by MWH Holdings, LLC. (Aivalikles, William)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 28, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Suslak, Brian)
January 8, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/21/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Savett on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Attorney Michael Savett added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's(pty:dft).(Savett, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Michael S. Savett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2058198.) filed by Certain Underwiters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Michael S. Savett, #2 Exhibit Statement of Concurrence)(Suslak, Brian)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
December 9, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. MWH Holdings, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by December 30, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 12/30/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
December 9, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2020CV-00536, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Suslak, Brian)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwiters at Lloyd's disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Suslak, Brian)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Certain Underwiters at Lloyd's.(Suslak, Brian)
December 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-1152-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court - Southern District, case number 226-2020-CV-00536 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2055479) filed by Certain Underwiters at Lloyd's. Answer Follow Up on 12/23/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint)(Suslak, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #2 Notice of Removal to State Court) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MWH Holdings, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwiters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Brian Andrew Suslak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Brian Andrew Suslak
Represented By: Michael Savett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MWH Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William E. Aivalikles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?