Hasu et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erma Beland, Lilith Hasu-Beland and Erma Hasu
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01199
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. with jury demand Re-Filed Notice of Amended Complaint and Re-Filed Amended Complaint filed by Erma Hasu, Lilith Hasu-Beland. (Attachments: #1 Re-file of Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Reck, Stephen)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. with jury demand filed by Erma Hasu, Lilith Hasu-Beland. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Reck, Stephen)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #9 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #9 MOTION to Dismiss to March 11, 2021 filed by Erma Hasu, Lilith Hasu-Beland.(Reck, Stephen)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 3/4/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 2/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - HCSC Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Article - Formula Feeding - The Basics and Beyond, #4 Exhibit 3 - Article - Our Commitment to Responsible Marketing of Infant Formula and Breast Milk Substitutes, #5 Exhibit 4 - Article - Our Global Policy on The Marketing of Infant Formula, #6 Exhibit 5 - Article - Breastfeeding Tips and Techniques - Providing Breast Milk for Your Premature Baby, #7 Exhibit 6 - The Role of HMOs in Reducing NEC, #8 Exhibit 7 - Canadian Pediatric Society Article, #9 Exhibit 8 - Klein Article, #10 Exhibit 9 - Canfield Article)(Graham, Owen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2020-cv-00558, Hillsborough County - Southern District County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Certified Copy of State Record - Part 2, #2 Continuation of Certified Copy of State Record - Part 3, #3 Continuation of Certified Copy of State Record - Part 4)(Graham, Owen)
January 20, 2021 Clerk's Notice - No STATE COURT RECORD filed pursuant to LR 81.1(c). "The removing party shall file with the clerk's office a certified or attested copy of the state court record within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the notice of removal." The removing party is directed to file the STATE COURT RECORD within 48 hours of this notice. (vln)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Answer Follow Up on 1/26/2021. (vln)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 26, 2021 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc..(Graham, Owen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen M. Reck on behalf of Erma Hasu, Lilith Hasu-Beland Attorney Stephen M. Reck added to party Erma Hasu(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen M. Reck added to party Lilith Hasu-Beland(pty:pla).(Reck, Stephen)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Graham, Owen)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 Assented to MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2064560.) filed by Erma Hasu(Spaneas, George)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2064560.) filed by Erma Hasu.(Spaneas, George)
December 29, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Affidavit filed by Erma Hasu. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (vln)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (vln)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(vln)
December 28, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
December 28, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by January 4, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 1/4/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
December 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-1199-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 24, 2020 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 21, 2021 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc..(Graham, Owen)
December 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court - Southern District, case number 226-2020-cv-558 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2063929) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 1/14/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed in Superior Court, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal filed in Superior Court, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Case Summary)(Graham, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasu et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Owen R. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Beland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilith Hasu-Beland
Represented By: George E. Spaneas
Represented By: Stephen M. Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Hasu
Represented By: George E. Spaneas
Represented By: Stephen M. Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?