Patten v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard Patten
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01207
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Proposed Discovery Plan Amended filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 03:00 PM is cancelled. Order to issue. (kad)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #10 Discovery Plan. Text of Order: The parties shall meet an confer prior to the February 23, 2021 pretrial conference and using Local Rule Civil Form 2 attempt to reach agreement on the deadlines therein. To the extent the parties are unable to reach agreement, the areas of dispute can be noted in a jointly submitted proposed discovery plan or the parties may file individual plans using Civil Form 2. The previously filed discovery plan (10) does not conform with Civil form 2 and, therefore, is not approved. The defendant shall submit a proposed discovery plan consistent with this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. Pretrial Conference via Video set for 2/23/2021 03:00 PM. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/19/2021.(kad)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Amended Notice of Hearing: (As to presiding judge only.) Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (ko)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via Video set for 2/23/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/16/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Snyder, Michael)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2020-CV-00848, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Certified Complaint, #2 Certified Summons, #3 Certified Notice of Removal)(Snyder, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ed)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2020-CV-00848 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2065382) filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 1/21/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter to State Court Clerk, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-1207-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Civil Action Cover Sheet (Corrected) by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Removal by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Action Cover Sheet by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter of Removal to State Court by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2020-CV-00848, Hillsborough County Northern District County Superior Court Attorney Michael L. Snyder added to party Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Snyder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patten v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Patten
Represented By: Kenneth R. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?