Ocado Innovation Ltd. et al v. AutoStore AS et al
Plaintiff: Ocado Solutions Ltd. and Ocado Innovation Ltd.
Defendant: AutoStore System Inc. and AutoStore AS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00041
Filed: January 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregg Locascio on behalf of AutoStore AS, AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Gregg Locascio added to party AutoStore AS(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Locascio added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Locascio, Gregg)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion for Gregg F. LoCascio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Scott on behalf of AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Emily Scott added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Scott, Emily)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ali-Reza Boloori on behalf of AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Ali-Reza Boloori added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Boloori, Ali-Reza)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Loy on behalf of AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Joseph Loy added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Loy, Joseph)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Gregg F. LoCascio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2083557.) filed by AutoStore System Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Gregg F. LoCascio)(Lucic, Robert)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Joseph A. Loy, P.C. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Ali-Reza Boloori to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Emily M. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Schusterman on behalf of Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd. Attorney Morgan Schusterman added to party Ocado Innovation Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Morgan Schusterman added to party Ocado Solutions Ltd.(pty:pla).(Schusterman, Morgan)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dustin Guzior on behalf of Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd. Attorney Dustin Guzior added to party Ocado Innovation Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Dustin Guzior added to party Ocado Solutions Ltd.(pty:pla).(Guzior, Dustin)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garrard Russ Beeney on behalf of Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd. Attorney Garrard Russ Beeney added to party Ocado Innovation Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Garrard Russ Beeney added to party Ocado Solutions Ltd.(pty:pla).(Beeney, Garrard)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #11 Amended Complaint filed by Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Innovation Ltd.. No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.(jb)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryanna Kleber Devonshire on behalf of AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Bryanna Kleber Devonshire added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Devonshire, Bryanna)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Emily M. Scott to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2081990.) filed by AutoStore System Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Emily M. Scott)(Lucic, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Ali-Reza Boloori to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2081983.) filed by AutoStore System Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Ali-Reza Boloori)(Lucic, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Joseph A. Loy, P.C. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2081978.) filed by AutoStore System Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Joseph A. Loy Affidavit)(Lucic, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Disclosure Statement by AutoStore System Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lucic, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Lucic, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2021: #1 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance- CORRECTED) (bt).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AutoStore AS, AutoStore System Inc. with jury demand filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit (Affidavit) DECLARATION OF HENRY C. QUILLEN, #24 Exhibit A to Declaration of Henry C. Quillen, #25 Certificate of Service)(Quillen, Henry)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Stipulation Regarding Deadlines by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Quillen, Henry)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AutoStore AS by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. Served/Mailed on 1/20/2021. Answer Follow Up on 4/23/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Quillen, Henry)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AutoStore System Inc. by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. Served/Mailed on 1/20/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/24/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Quillen, Henry)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #10 NOTICE of Stipulation Regarding Deadlines. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (ed)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summonses issued electronically as to AutoStore AS, AutoStore System Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-41-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Morgan N. Schusterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # BNHDC-2071796.) filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd..Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Morgan N. Schusterman)(Quillen, Henry)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Dustin F. Guzior to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2071795.) filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd..Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Dustin F. Guzior)(Quillen, Henry)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Garrard R. Beeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2071794.) filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd..Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Garrard R. Beeney)(Quillen, Henry)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Quillen, Henry)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2071789 filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 Summons - Waiver, #26 Summons - Waiver)(Quillen, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocado Innovation Ltd. et al v. AutoStore AS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoStore System Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Loy
Represented By: Emily Scott
Represented By: Ali-Reza Boloori
Represented By: Bryanna Kleber Devonshire
Represented By: Gregg Locascio
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoStore AS
Represented By: Gregg Locascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocado Solutions Ltd.
Represented By: Henry Clay Quillen
Represented By: Dustin Guzior
Represented By: Garrard Russ Beeney
Represented By: Morgan Schusterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocado Innovation Ltd.
Represented By: Henry Clay Quillen
Represented By: Dustin Guzior
Represented By: Garrard Russ Beeney
Represented By: Morgan Schusterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?