Smith v. Baron's Major Brands, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark K. Smith
Defendant: Baron's Major Brands, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00163
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Baron's Major Brands, LLC by Mark K. Smith. Served/Mailed on 2/24/2021. Answer Follow Up on 4/28/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiverissued electronically as to Baron's Major Brands, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice) (ed)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
February 23, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
February 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-163-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2083385 filed by Mark K. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Smith email Feb17,2019, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice ECF Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Baron's Major Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baron's Major Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark K. Smith
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?