Heredia v. Roscoe et al
Plaintiff: Chasrick Heredia
Defendant: Canada Stewart, Nathan Harrington, Michael Roscoe, Matthew Nocella and Other Unknown Manchester Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2021cv00198
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving in part re #5 Discovery Plan. The discovery plan is approved with changes. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/5/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 3/4/2022. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/18/2022. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/6/2021.(vln)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone is CANCELLED. Order to issue. (vln)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint/Stipulated) filed by Chasrick Heredia. (Martin, Stephen)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 4/22/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Nathan Harrington, Matthew Nocella, Other Unknown Manchester Police Officers, Michael Roscoe, Canada Stewart.(Elliott, Samantha)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2021-CV-00052, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Elliott, Samantha)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-198-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen T. Martin on behalf of Chasrick Heredia Attorney Stephen T. Martin added to party Chasrick Heredia(pty:pla).(Martin, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2021-CV-00052 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2088352) filed by Canada Stewart, Matthew Nocella, Michael Roscoe, Nathan Harrington. Answer Follow Up on 3/26/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Superior Court, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Elliott, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heredia v. Roscoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canada Stewart
Represented By: Samantha Dowd Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Harrington
Represented By: Samantha Dowd Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Roscoe
Represented By: Samantha Dowd Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Nocella
Represented By: Samantha Dowd Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Manchester Police Officers
Represented By: Samantha Dowd Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasrick Heredia
Represented By: Stephen T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?