Primal Hardwere, LLC v. Primal Wear, Inc.
Plaintiff: Primal Hardwere, LLC
Defendant: Primal Wear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00232
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re Rule 16 Scheduling Order. A pretrial conference will be scheduled after resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss (doc. no. #7 ). Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) to after the rescheduled pretrial conference. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, To Transfer Venue filed by Primal Wear, Inc.. Attorney Edward J. Sackman added to party Primal Wear, Inc.(pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 5/21/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1 -- U.S. Trademark Reg. No. 3494801, #3 Exhibit 2 -- U.S. Trademark Reg. No. 4198616, #4 Exhibit 3 -- U.S. Trademark Reg. No. 4682284, #5 Exhibit 4 -- Docket for Case No. 1:21-cv-00999-KLM, #6 Exhibit 5 -- Declaration of Dave Edwards)(Sackman, Edward)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Primal Wear, Inc. by Primal Hardwere, LLC. Served/Mailed on 3/18/2021. Answer Follow Up on 5/17/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parker, Robert) Modified on 3/26/2021 to correct served date and answer follow up (jb).
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (ed)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Primal Hardwere, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Parker, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Primal Wear, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Primal Hardwere, LLC(Parker, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2093416 filed by Primal Hardwere, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- cease-and-desist 1/8/2021, #2 Exhibit B- plaintiff's correspondence 1/21/2021, #3 Exhibit C- defendant's rejection 2/18/2021, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #5 Civil Covert Sheet Signed) (ed).
March 18, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-232-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
March 18, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
March 18, 2021 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Primal Hardwere, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Primal Hardwere, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by March 25, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 3/25/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primal Hardwere, LLC v. Primal Wear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primal Wear, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primal Hardwere, LLC
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?