Burman v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Allah Burman
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2021cv00245
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's Certificate transmitting Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals documents numbered 6-10, re #8 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Notice of Appeal mailed to all parties this date.(js)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 Appeal Cover Sheet as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Allah Burman. (js)
July 8, 2021 Appellate Case Number: First Circuit Court of Appeals #21-1516 re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Allah Burman.(js)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Report and Recommendation by Allah Burman. Filing fee NOT PAID. File-stamped copy to be sent to parties/USCA by Clerks Office. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel and pro se parties should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf(js)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (js)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ///ORDER denying #3 Motion in Pursuant to 28 USC 2243 for an Order to Return an Answer to the Writ within Three Days; approving #4 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendation filed by Allah Burman. (js)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, #3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, recommending the district judge should: 1) dismiss Burman's petition (Doc. No. 1) due to a lack of jurisdiction, without prejudice to Burman's ability to seek permission in the Fourth Circuit to file a successive 2255 motion in the District of Maryland, and 2) deny the motion for relief under 2243 (Doc. No. 3). Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/3/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION in Pursuant to 28 USC 2243 for an Order to Return an Answer to the Writ within Three Days filed by Allah Burman.(mc)
May 12, 2021 Case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. New case number is 1:21-cv-245-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 5/24/2021.(mc)
March 23, 2021 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (mc)
March 23, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Allah Burman.(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burman v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allah Burman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?