Jain v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Sandeep Jain
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2021cv00258
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston by Sandeep Jain. Served/Mailed on 4/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 6/3/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Zakre, Sheila)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons and Waiver issued electronically as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice) (ed)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Sandeep Jain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver Notice of Suit-request to waive)(Zakre, Sheila) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2021: #4 Waiver of Service of Summons) (ed).
March 29, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
March 29, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-258-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jain v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandeep Jain
Represented By: Sheila O'Leary Zakre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?