McNeil v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: James R. McNeil
Defendant: Kendra Neri, Scott Sweet, Brian Williams, Frank Cassidy and Timothy Beers
Case Number: 1:2021cv00261
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by James R. McNeil. (ko)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Text of Order: Plaintiff James McNeil has filed a motion (Doc. No. 3) asking the court to appoint counsel to represent him in this matter. The matter has not yet been preliminarily reviewed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a) and LR 4.3(d)(1). Mr. McNeil has not demonstrated that, at this stage of the proceedings, that exceptional circumstances [are] present such that a denial of counsel [would be] likely to result in fundamental unfairness impinging on his due process rights. DesRosiers v. Moran, 949 F.2d 15, 23 (1st Cir. 1991) (citations omitted). Accordingly, Mr. McNeil's motion for court-appointed counsel (Doc. No. 3) is DENIED, without prejudice to his ability to renew that motion after the court conducts its preliminary review in this matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; granting #5 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to the plaintiffs account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. Finance Follow Up Deadline 8/23/2021 (mc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Prisoner Consent Form filed by James R. McNeil. (mc)
June 22, 2021 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. New case number is 1:21-cv-261-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs and Prisoner Consent Form. Compliance Deadline set for 7/9/2021. (mc)
May 11, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James R. McNeil.(mc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 INCOMPLETE MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate filed by James R. McNeil.(mc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Beers, Frank Cassidy, Kendra Neri, Scott Sweet, Brian Williams with Jury Demand filed by James R. McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2021: #2 Summonses) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?