McCarthy v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniel McCarthy
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00270
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #8 Notice of Settlement. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(Decker, Byrne)
May 7, 2021 The Parties advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 6/7/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ///ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Joint Assented to Motion to Dismiss Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company without Prejudice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js) Modified on 4/19/2021 to add: ///(js).
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Assented to MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company without Prejudice filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2021-cv-00137, Rockingham Superior Court County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Service - Mass Mutual, #3 Complaint, #4 Ex. A to Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Filing Removal, #6 Affidavit of Service Lincoln, #7 Summons)(Decker, Byrne)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 7, 2021 filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 ERISA Notice sent to all parties. (ed)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Decker, Byrne)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Decker, Byrne)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 ERISA NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2021-cv-00137 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2098863) filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 4/23/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/16/2021. ERISA Administrative Record Due 4/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Docs Lincoln, #2 Exhibit B - Service Docs Mass Mutual, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Decker, Byrne)
April 2, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to May 7, 2021. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (js)
April 2, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-270-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCarthy
Represented By: James W. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?