Cintron v. First Student, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raphael Cintron
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00320
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher B. Kaczmarek on behalf of First Student, Inc. Attorney Christopher B. Kaczmarek added to party First Student, Inc.(pty:dft).(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First Student, Inc. by Raphael Cintron. Served/Mailed on 4/21/2021. Answer Follow Up on 6/23/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to First Student, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiverand all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
April 21, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
April 20, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-320-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2105182 filed by Raphael Cintron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit DOT Medical Form, #3 Exhibit DOT Medical Card, #4 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #5 Exhibit Right-to-Sue, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Lawsuit, #8 Waiver of Service)(Douglass, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cintron v. First Student, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Kaczmarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael Cintron
Represented By: Megan E. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?