Schott v. Howe et al
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Schott
Defendant: Brian Howe, City of Nashua, Nashua Police Commission and Nashua, NH, City of
Case Number: 1:2021cv00327
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brian Howe by Bradley A. Schott. Served/Mailed on 4/27/2021. Answer Follow Up on 6/29/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglas, Charles)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nashua Police Commission, Nashua, NH, City of by Bradley A. Schott. Served/Mailed on 4/27/2021. Answer Follow Up on 6/29/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Douglas, Charles)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Brian Howe, Nashua Police Commission, Nashua, NH, City of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
April 26, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-327-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2106379 filed by Bradley A. Schott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Nashua Police Commissioners, #2 Exhibit 2- Police report, #3 Exhibit 3- Schott's complaint, #4 Exhibit 4- Carignan letter, #5 Exhibit 5- Nashua Property Casualty letter, #6 Exhibit 6- Union Leader article, #7 Exhibit 7- Internal affairs investigations 2017, #8 Exhibit 8- Internal affairs investigations 2020, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Notice ECF Notice of Lawsuit- Howe, #11 Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service- Howe, #12 Notice ECF Notice of Lawsuit- Nashua, #13 Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service- Nashua, #14 Notice ECF Notice of Lawsuit- Nashua Police, #15 Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service- Nashua Police)(Douglas, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schott v. Howe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Nashua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashua Police Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashua, NH, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Schott
Represented By: Charles G. Douglas, III
Represented By: Samantha J Heuring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?