Doiron v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Doiron
Defendant: Jon Fouts, Chris Kench, James Brown, FNU Barton and NH State Prison, Warden
Not Classified By Court: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00360
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #5 Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court grants Mr. Doiron leave to amend his complaint, or to file an addendum to his initial complaint, no later than July 23, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/23/2021.)(lw)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, recommending that the district judge deny Mr. Doiron's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. No. 2) without prejudice. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 6/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Text of Order: Plaintiff Arthur Doiron has filed a motion (Doc. No. 3) asking the court to appoint counsel to represent him in this matter, alleging that he has limited access to legal materials, mental health issues, and no formal legal training. Mr. Doiron also asserts that having counsel would prevent prison officers from reading his legal documents and retaliating against him for their content. The difficulties Mr. Doiron faces in litigating this case are of the type typically faced by prisoners engaged in litigation, and Mr. Doiron has failed to demonstrate that exceptional circumstances [are] present such that a denial of counsel [would be] likely to result in fundamental unfairness impinging on his due process rights. DesRosiers v. Moran, 949 F.2d 15, 23 (1st Cir. 1991) (citations omitted). Further, in his filings in this case to date, Mr. Doiron has demonstrated an ability to clearly state his factual assertions and legal arguments. Accordingly, Mr. Doiron's motion for court-appointed counsel (Doc. No. 3) is DENIED without prejudice to his ability to refile a similar motion if changed circumstances warrant such relief in the future. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint. Text of Order: Plaintiff Arthur Doiron has filed a motion (Doc. No. 4) seeking leave to file a supplement to his initial complaint, to add claims and defendants to this matter. Without comment on the merits of the claims and assertions in the complaint supplement, the motion is GRANTED, and the complaint supplement (Doc. No. 4-1) will be considered to be part of the complaint in this matter for all purposes. As such, it is subject to preliminary review under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a) and LR 4.3(d)(1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by Arthur Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Complaint, #2 Envelope)(lw)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Arthur Doiron.(lw)
May 4, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Doiron. (ed)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Barton, James Brown, Jon Fouts, Chris Kench, NH State Prison, Warden with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5.3.21) filed by Arthur Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ed)
May 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-360-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doiron v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fouts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Doiron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?