Boisvert v. Grafton County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Mindy Boisvert
Defendant: Grafton County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00387
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for Tuesday, July 13, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #5 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint/Assented To) filed by Grafton County Sheriff's Department. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (ko)
July 4, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint/Assented To) filed by Grafton County Sheriff's Department. (Burrows, Matthew)
June 14, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via video-conference set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/6/2021. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Grafton County Sheriff's Department.(Burrows, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 6/11/2022. (jb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to June 11, 2021 filed by Grafton County Sheriff's Department.(Burrows, Matthew)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2021-CV-00118, Grafton County Superior Court(Burrows, Matthew)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Grafton County Superior Court, case number 215-2021-CV-00118 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2113449) filed by Grafton County Sheriff's Department. Answer Follow Up on 6/2/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Superior Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Burrows, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2021: #5 Double Spaced Removal) (mc).
May 12, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-387-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boisvert v. Grafton County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grafton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Boisvert
Represented By: George H. Ostler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?