IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan, Trustees v. Doe
Plaintiff: Trustees of the IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan and IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan, Trustees
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00388
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Subpoena for First National Bank of Coweta. Text of Order: Granted; so ordered. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Subpoena for First National Bank of Coweta filed by IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan, Trustees.Follow up on Objection on 7/2/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena Requested from Clerk)(Hedges, Katherine)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion Seeking relief from LR 4.1, and for summons to instead be submitted after defendant is identified, and to allow all pleadings filed to be served on the defendant once he/she is identified. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
May 19, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
May 13, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-388-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Seeking relief from LR 4.1, and for summons to instead be submitted after defendant is identified, and to allow all pleadings filed to be served on the defendant once he/she is identified. filed by Trustees of the IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan.Follow up on Objection on 5/27/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hedges, Katherine)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2113731 filed by Trustees of the IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hedges, Katherine) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan, Trustees v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 490 Pension Plan, Trustees
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?