Touchton v. Harvey et al
Plaintiff: Georgiana Touchton
Defendant: Daniel Harvey and State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00468
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Daniel Harvey by Georgiana Touchton. Served/Mailed on 7/21/2021. Answer Follow Up on 9/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Johnson, Valerie)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Connor, Doreen)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. Attorney Doreen F. Connor added to party State Farm Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 7/29/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Connor, Doreen)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Daniel Harvey, State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
June 2, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
June 1, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-468-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2120311 filed by Georgiana Touchton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Valerie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #2 Complaint Double Spaced, #3 Summons - Waiver Harvey, #4 Summons - Waiver State Farm) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Touchton v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Doreen F. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiana Touchton
Represented By: Valerie Tamar Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?