McMenamon v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
Plaintiff: Richard A. McMenamon, II
Defendant: Eileen Rispoli, Eileen Lofton Rispoli, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner and Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director
Case Number: 1:2021cv00479
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Richard A. McMenamon, II. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(vln)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER PROHIBITING REMOTE ELECTRONIC ACCESS So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibits A - D to #1 Complaint, by Richard A. McMenamon, II.(vln)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Richard A. McMenamon, proceeding in forma pauperis and without an attorney, has filed a civil complaint (Doc. No. 1) that is before the court for preliminary review. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and LR 4.3(d)(1). Upon reviewing McMenamon's filings, it appears that McMenamon has inadvertently omitted certain exhibits referred to in his complaint which are not included in his attached exhibits (Doc. No. 1-3). The omitted exhibits appear to include Exhibits A-D. Accordingly, the court grants McMenamon leave until July 9, 2021 to submit the missing exhibits before the court completes its preliminary review So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (mc)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Richard A. McMenamon, II. (mc)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Eileen Rispoli with Jury Demand filed by Richard A. McMenamon, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses) (mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2021: #3 Exhibit Attachments) (mc).
June 4, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
June 4, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-479-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMenamon v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Rispoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Lofton Rispoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division for Children, Youth and Families, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. McMenamon, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?