SLC Group Holdings, LLC et al v. Sell-Able LLC et al
Plaintiff: SLC Group Holdings, LLC and YukBGone, LLC
Defendant: Solomon Brown and Sell-Able LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00523
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving with changes #10 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 - 3 days. Non-jury/bench trial. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/20/2021. Mediation Follow Up on 12/15/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/15/2022. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 3/20/2022. (de)
July 23, 2021 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 6/15/2022. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 6/29/2022. Bench Trial set for the two-week period beginning 7/19/2022 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2022 at 04:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (de)
July 16, 2021 Deadline terminated: Pretrial Conference 07/22/2021 Cancelled. Order to Issue. (de)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by SLC Group Holdings, LLC, YukBGone, LLC. (Spear, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to Motion for James Stafford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(de)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by YukBGone, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Spear, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by SLC Group Holdings, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Spear, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for James Stafford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2129265.) filed by Solomon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of James Stafford, III, #2 Exhibit LR 7.1 Statement of Concurrence, #3 Proposed Order On Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Rizzo, Rosario)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Priya K. Jesani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(de)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Sell-Able LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rizzo, Rosario)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Addendum/ to #3 MOTION for Priya K. Jesani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2127814.) by Solomon Brown. (Rizzo, Rosario)
June 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #3 MOTION for Priya K. Jesani to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Solomon Brown. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 3. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 6/24/2021.(de)
June 22, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via video conference set for 7/22/2021 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/15/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(bt)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Solomon Brown.(Rizzo, Rosario)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Priya K. Jesani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2127814.) filed by Solomon Brown.Follow up on Objection on 7/6/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Jesani, #2 Proposed Order On Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Rizzo, Rosario)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2021-CV-00240, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Rizzo, Rosario)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Solomon Brown. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Sell-Able LLC shall file a disclosure statement by June 23, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 6/23/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Solomon Brown. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. SLC Group Holdings, LLC and YukBGone, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by July 7, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 7/7/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
June 14, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-523-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough South, case number 226-2021-CV-00240 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2125355) filed by Solomon Brown. Answer Follow Up on 7/6/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/28/2021. Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Rizzo, Rosario) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #1 Notice of Removal State Court, #2 Notice of Removal Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLC Group Holdings, LLC et al v. Sell-Able LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Brown
Represented By: Rosario M. F. Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sell-Able LLC
Represented By: Rosario M. F. Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLC Group Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YukBGone, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?