Pearson v. Eldridge
Plaintiff: Brian Pearson
Defendant: Tyler Eldridge
Case Number: 1:2021cv00567
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #4 Discovery Plan. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order with the following modifications: 9/7/2022. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
July 21, 2021 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 9/7/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 8/3/2022. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/17/2022. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/1/2022.(vln)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint) filed by Tyler Eldridge. (Mordecai, Adam)
July 6, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Discovery Plan DUE BY 8/11/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Tyler Eldridge.(Mordecai, Adam)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 212-2021-cv-70, Carroll County Superior Court(Mordecai, Adam)
June 29, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
June 28, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-567-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Carroll County Superior Court, case number 211-2021-cv-70 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2130707) filed by Tyler Eldridge. Answer Follow Up on 7/19/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Parties, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mordecai, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Eldridge
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Pearson
Represented By: Jared Joseph Bedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?