DiIorio-Sterling v. Capstone Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christina DiIorio-Sterling
Defendant: Kenneth Solinsky, OnPoint Systems, Rochester Precision Optics, LLC, Capstone Management, LLC and OnPoint Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00569
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 10/5/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Follow up on Objection on 9/1/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (gla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to September 1, 2021 filed by Christina DiIorio-Sterling.(Carroll, Laura)
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rochester Precision Optics, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 9/3/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Offer Letter)(Cullen, Brian)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capstone Management, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 9/3/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Capstone's, #2 Exhibit Offer Letter)(Deragon, Beth)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Follow up on Objection on 8/26/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
August 5, 2021 Corrective Entry to #18 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to August 26, 2021. Entry corrected by removing reference to conventionally filed exhibits. (js)
August 4, 2021 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to August 26, 2021 filed by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. (Carroll, Laura) Modified on 8/5/2021 to remove reference to conventionally filed exhibits (js).
August 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beth R. Myers on behalf of Christina DiIorio-Sterling Attorney Beth R. Myers added to party Christina DiIorio-Sterling(pty:pla).(Myers, Beth)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Assented to MOTION for Ellen J. Zucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Assented to MOTION for Beth R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
July 29, 2021 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #15 Assented to MOTION for Ellen J. Zucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 Assented to MOTION for Beth R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (js)
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Beth R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2142729.) filed by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Beth R. Myers in support of Motion for PHV Admission)(Carroll, Laura)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Ellen J. Zucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2142725.) filed by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Ellen J. Zucker in support of Motion for PHV Admission)(Carroll, Laura)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 Partial ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC.(Broth, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 8/5/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memo of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Memo of Law, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Memo of Law, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Memo of Law)(Broth, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kenneth Solinsky.Follow up on Objection on 8/5/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memo of Law)(Broth, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark T. Broth on behalf of OnPoint Systems, LLC, Kenneth Solinsky Attorney Mark T. Broth added to party OnPoint Systems, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark T. Broth added to party Kenneth Solinsky(pty:dft).(Broth, Mark)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 20, 2021 filed by Capstone Management, LLC.(Deragon, Beth)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beth A. Deragon on behalf of Capstone Management, LLC Attorney Beth A. Deragon added to party Capstone Management, LLC(pty:dft).(Deragon, Beth)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terri L. Pastori on behalf of Capstone Management, LLC Attorney Terri L. Pastori added to party Capstone Management, LLC(pty:dft).(Pastori, Terri)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to August 20, 2021. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (js)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian J.S. Cullen on behalf of Rochester Precision Optics, LLC Attorney Brian J.S. Cullen added to party Rochester Precision Optics, LLC(pty:dft).(Cullen, Brian)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Kenneth Solinsky by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. Served/Mailed on 7/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 7/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carroll, Laura)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to OnPoint Systems, LLC by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. Served/Mailed on 7/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 7/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carroll, Laura)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Rochester Precision Optics, LLC by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. Served/Mailed on 7/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 7/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carroll, Laura)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Capstone Management, LLC by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. Served/Mailed on 7/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 7/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carroll, Laura)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Capstone Management, LLC, OnPoint Systems, LLC, Rochester Precision Optics, LLC, Kenneth Solinsky. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
June 29, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
June 28, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-569-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2130960 filed by Christina DiIorio-Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Summons to Capstone Management, LLC, #3 Summons - Waiver Summons to Rochester Precision Optics, LLC, #4 Summons - Waiver Summons to OnPoint Systems, LLC, #5 Summons - Waiver Summons to Kenneth Solinsky)(Carroll, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiIorio-Sterling v. Capstone Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Solinsky
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnPoint Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Precision Optics, LLC
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Management, LLC
Represented By: Beth A. Deragon
Represented By: Terri L. Pastori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnPoint Systems, LLC
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina DiIorio-Sterling
Represented By: Laura L. Carroll
Represented By: Beth R. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?