Lewis v. The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates et al
Plaintiff: Allan Lewis
Defendant: The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates and State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch
Case Number: 1:2021cv00597
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO THE HYNES GROUP AND BRIER RIDGE ESTATES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO DENY THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION WITH PREJUDICE RE #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allan Lewis. Follow up on Reply on 9/16/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (js)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE Regarding Summary Judgment.(js)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates.Follow up on Objection on 9/13/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Griffin, Kyle)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates.Follow up on Objection on 9/29/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NH Supreme Court Order- Dismissal, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Christine Hogan, #3 Exhibit Briar Ridge Estates Rules/Regulations, #4 Exhibit Criminal Background- Mr. Lewis, #5 Exhibit Hynes Group Rental Policy, #6 Exhibit Credit Report- Mr. Lewis)(Griffin, Kyle)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File The Judicial Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 THE PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR THE DUE PROCESS OF LAW BE ALLOWED TO CONTINUE IN THIS MATTER RE #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allan Lewis. Follow up on Reply on 8/24/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (js)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER RULE # 56 filed by Allan Lewis.Follow up on Objection on 9/16/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER RULE # 56 filed by Allan Lewis.Follow up on Objection on 9/15/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch.Follow up on Objection on 8/26/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #1, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #6, #4 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #8, #5 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #9, #6 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #13, #7 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #15, #8 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #34, #9 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #35, #10 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #37, #11 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #38, #12 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #39, #13 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #40, #14 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #45, #15 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #48, #16 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #51, #17 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #60, #18 Exhibit Superior Court Action Index #63)(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File The Judicial Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch.Follow up on Objection on 8/26/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin on behalf of State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch(pty:dft).(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch, The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates by Allan Lewis. Served/Mailed on 7/21/2021. Answer Follow Up on 8/11/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (js)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Griffin, Kyle)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates.(Griffin, Kyle)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Patrick Griffin on behalf of The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates Attorney Kyle Patrick Griffin added to party The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates(pty:dft).(Griffin, Kyle)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO THE N.H. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF A CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO A STATE STATUTE THAT IS BEING CALLED INTO QUESTION CASE FILED IN FEDERAL COURT DOCKET # 21-CV-00597 by Allan Lewis.(js)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses issued IN HAND as to State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch, The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
July 13, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates and State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14649020632) filed by Allan Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver) (ed)
July 12, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-597-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hynes Group and Brier Ridge Estates
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Hampshire Judicial Branch
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?