Brooks v. Governor, NH, State of
Plaintiff: Troy E. Brooks
Defendant: Governor, NH, State of
Case Number: 1:2021cv00610
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #23 MOTION/Objection to Motion for Finding of Fact Motion for Change of Venue. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION/Objection to Motion for Finding of Fact Motion for Change of Venue filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17-21 - 3/30/21 Letter, #2 Exhibit 22 - Concord Monitor Article)(jb)
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #21 Report and Recommendation and #12 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (jb)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ///ORDER approving #12 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Addend Complaint; denying #14 Motion for Criminal Investigation Petty Theft, Obstruction of Justice, Witness Tampering, Perjury - w/unequivocal documentary proof; granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Record Correction; denying #17 Motion to Recuse - Judge Who Covered Up Crucial "Facts" in Case Criminal Intentionally or Incompetently and or both Malfeasance - illegal; denying #18 Motion for Finding of Fact Judicial Misconduct. Mr. Brooks's Complaint Upon consideration does not alter the recommendation of dismissal contained in the August 30 R&R. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendation filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 - 3/30/21 Letter from NH Law Library, #2 Exhibit 18 - Petition of Troy E. Brooks, #3 Exhibit 19 - Sandra L. Scheiner Examiner of Questioned Documents, #4 Exhibit 20 - Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 21 - Period of Limitations)(jb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Finding of Fact Judicial Misconduct filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Summary HCSC 216-1993-DM-05059)(jb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Recuse - Judge Who Covered Up Crucial "Facts" in Case Criminal Intentionally or Incompetently and or both Malfeasance - illegal filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Hillsborough County SC & Jaffrey DC document)(jb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Record Correction filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2 - miscellaneous filings)(jb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Criminal Investigation Petty Theft, Obstruction of Justice, Witness Tampering, Perjury - w/unequivocal documentary proof filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Erica Bodwell v. Mark Bodwell Master recommendation, #2 Exhibit 12 - "B v. G. 1-21-cv-00610", #3 Exhibit 13 - Stipulations, #4 Exhibit 14 - "petty theft from taxpayers")(jb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 15 Addendum/ to #1 Complaint by Troy E. Brooks. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence 1 - maintained conventionally, #2 Exhibit Evidence 10 - maintained conventionally, #3 Envelope and cover letter)(jb)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Waive Fees; #4 Motion to Seal Medical Records of All Bodwells (mine stay open); #6 Motion for Federal Court N.H. file complete in Troy E. Brooks v. N.H. Supreme Court ex al; #10 Pretrial Motion for Hearing on Crime Victimization. Mr. Brooks may file as outlined if this action is not dismissed when the District Judge rules on the R&R issued this date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ///REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Motion/Pretrial Motion Question of Law, and #8 Motion for for Interlocutory Transfer Without Ruling to SCOTUS, recommending that the district judge deny the motions for a TRO (doc. no. #5 ), ruling on a question of law (doc. no. #7 ), and to transfer the case to the USSC (doc. no. #8 ); dismiss the case in its entirely for failure to state a claim; and direct the clerk's office to enter judgment and close the case. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 9/13/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 Letter to Troy Brooks from Clerk of Court re: Copy of docket sheet (jb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 Pretrial MOTION for Hearing on Crime Victimization filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Impact of Crime Victimization on Quality of Life)(jb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 Addendum/ to #1 Complaint by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unopened letters, #2 Envelope)(jb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Interlocutory Transfer Without Ruling to SCOTUS filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION/Pretrial Motion Question of Law filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elliott Hospital Laboratory)(jb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Federal Court N.H. file complete in Troy E. Brooks v. N.H. Supreme Court ex al filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Seal Medical Records of All Bodwells (mine stay open) filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Laboratory Record)(jb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Waive Fees filed by Troy E. Brooks.(jb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Troy E. Brooks. (ed)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Governor, NH, State of with Jury Demand filed by Troy E. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Obstruction Letter, #2 Envelope) (ed)
July 21, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-610-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Assuming the stated income is intended to reflect annual and not monthly income, or the plaintiff has misplaced commas and periods in the stated income amounts, the plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
July 21, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Governor, NH, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy E. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor, NH, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?