Mercogliano v. Foss et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Mercogliano
Defendant: Matthew Foss, James Stone, Benjamin Turner, Jeffrey Dillon, Nashua, NH, City of and Nashua Police Commission
Case Number: 1:2021cv00664
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Joseph Bedrick on behalf of Ronald Mercogliano Attorney Jared Joseph Bedrick added to party Ronald Mercogliano(pty:pla).(Bedrick, Jared)
August 31, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Reason for Reassignment: Motion to Reassign Granted. The new case designation is: 21-cv-664-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(js)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases this case with 1:20-cv-00583 and 1:21-cv-00327 for Discovery Purposes Only and to Reassign Case for All Purposes. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases this case with 1:20-cv-00583 and 1:21-cv-00327 for Discovery Purposes Only and to Reassign Case for All Purposes filed by Ronald Mercogliano.(Douglass, Megan) Modified on 8/30/2021 to update case number from 20-cv-327 to 21-cv-327.(js)
August 30, 2021 Corrective Entry to #9 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases this case with 1:20-cv-00583 and 1:21-cv-00327 for Discovery Purposes Only and to Reassign Case for All Purposes. Entry corrected to update case number from 20-cv-327 to 21-cv-327. (js)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Benjamin Turner by Ronald Mercogliano. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nashua Police Commission by Ronald Mercogliano. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nashua, NH, City of by Ronald Mercogliano. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jeffrey Dillon by Ronald Mercogliano. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to James Stone by Ronald Mercogliano. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matthew Foss by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Douglass, Megan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Jeffrey Dillon, Matthew Foss, Nashua Police Commission, Nashua, NH, City of, James Stone, Benjamin Turner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
August 16, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 10, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-664-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. Case Follow Up Deadline set for 11/8/2021. (ed)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNHDC-2146970 filed by Ronald Mercogliano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - NPD, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - SOP 30A, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - SOP 7B, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - SOP 7E, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Spec Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - Waiver, #8 Notice of Lawsuit, #9 Summons - Waiver, #10 Notice of Lawsuit, #11 Summons - Waiver, #12 Notice of Lawsuit, #13 Summons - Waiver, #14 Notice of Lawsuit, #15 Summons - Waiver, #16 Notice of Lawsuit, #17 Summons - Waiver, #18 Notice of Lawsuit)(Douglas, Charles

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercogliano v. Foss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Mercogliano
Represented By: Megan E. Douglass
Represented By: Samantha J Heuring
Represented By: Charles G. Douglas, III
Represented By: Jared Joseph Bedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashua, NH, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashua Police Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?