Currier et al v. Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Currier, Jennifer Rhodes and Loyal Order of Moose Lodge Newport Lodge #1236
Defendant: Moose International, Inc., Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc., American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company, Loyal Order of Moose Lodge, Newport Lodge #1236 and Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose
Case Number: 1:2021cv00667
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M. Dealy on behalf of Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc., Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose Attorney John M. Dealy added to party Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Dealy added to party Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose(pty:dft).(Dealy, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott T. Ober on behalf of Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc., Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose Attorney Scott T. Ober added to party Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott T. Ober added to party Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose(pty:dft).(Ober, Scott)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Great American Assurance Company by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 8/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/18/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lahey, Matthew) Modified on 9/28/2021 to change service date and internal answer follow up date (jb).
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Naomi L. Getman on behalf of Great American Assurance Company (Getman, Naomi)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Naomi L. Getman on behalf of Great American Assurance Company Attorney Naomi L. Getman added to party Great American Assurance Company(pty:dft).(Getman, Naomi)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 9/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/7/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lahey, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 8/17/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/19/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lahey, Matthew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Richard Corson on behalf of American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company Attorney Brett Richard Corson added to party American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Corson, Brett)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gemini Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 9/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 11/3/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lahey, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Matthew J. Lahey added to party Melissa Currier(pty:pla). Served/Mailed on 8/26/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/28/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lahey, Matthew)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jennifer Rhodes.(Lahey, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2021: #1 pdf text searchable amended complaint) (jb).
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc., Gemini Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, Moose International, Inc., Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 16, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 11, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-667-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2147820 filed by Jennifer Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice - American Empire, #3 Exhibit Notice - Fraternal Ins, #4 Exhibit Notice - Gemini, #5 Exhibit Notice - Great American, #6 Exhibit Notice - Moose International, #7 Exhibit Notice - Newport Lodge, #8 Exhibit Waiver - American Empire, #9 Exhibit Waiver - Fraternal Ins, #10 Exhibit Waiver - Gemini, #11 Exhibit Waiver - Great American, #12 Exhibit Waiver - Moose International, #13 Exhibit Waiver - Newport Lodge)(Lahey, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currier et al v. Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Currier
Represented By: Philip R. Waystack, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Witmon
Represented By: Matthew J. Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew J. Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyal Order of Moose Lodge Newport Lodge #1236
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moose International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraternal Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Dealy
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett Richard Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company
Represented By: Naomi L. Getman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyal Order of Moose Lodge, Newport Lodge #1236
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Lodge No. 1236, Local Order of Moose
Represented By: John M. Dealy
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?