Lawlor v. Two Thirds Motors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter Lawlor
Defendant: Two Thirds Motors, Inc. doing business as Walier Chevrolet
Case Number: 1:2021cv00700
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving (with changes) #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/1/2021. Mediation Follow Up on 5/2/2022. Discovery deadline 11/1/2022. Mid-Litigation Discovery Status Conference set for 10/18/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 10/14/2022. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/28/2022.(jb)
September 30, 2021 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 3/7/2023. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/21/2023. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/4/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
September 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/21/2021. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo, Lauren S. Irwin) (Defts Atty: K. Joshua Scott)(Total Hearing Time: 9 minutes) (ko)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Two Thirds Motors, Inc. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference via video-conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 21, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Two Thirds Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Production Format)(Scott, K.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #6 Assented to MOTION to Reschedule Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Denied. After consulting with Chief Judge McCafferty, the court will reschedule this conference for 4:15 pm, after the Lawlor trial adjourns for the day. If counsel would prefer to keep the 3pm time (this Preliminary Pretrial Conference clearly does not require coverage by two attorneys), they should notify the court and the 3pm time will be left undisturbed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Reschedule Pretrial Conference filed by Peter Lawlor.(Irwin, Lauren)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly M.R. Sullivan on behalf of Two Thirds Motors, Inc. Attorney Kimberly M.R. Sullivan added to party Two Thirds Motors, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sullivan, Kimberly)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Two Thirds Motors, Inc..(Scott, K.)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via video-conference set for 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/14/2021.The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 213-2021-cv-00085, Cheshire County Superior Court(Scott, K.)
August 23, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ed)
August 20, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-700-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Two Thirds Motors, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Scott, K.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Cheshire County Superior Court, case number 213-2021-cv-00085 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2151348) filed by Two Thirds Motors, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 9/10/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawlor v. Two Thirds Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lawlor
Represented By: Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo
Represented By: Lauren S. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Thirds Motors, Inc. doing business as Walier Chevrolet
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Represented By: Kimberly M.R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?