Petalas v. Hampstead Outlook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sandra Petalas
Defendant: Hampstead Outlook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00713
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth A. Bailey on behalf of Hampstead Outlook, Inc. Attorney Elizabeth A. Bailey added to party Hampstead Outlook, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bailey, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hampstead Outlook, Inc. by Sandra Petalas. Served/Mailed on 9/7/2021. Answer Follow Up on 11/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Iacopino, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Hampstead Outlook, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 3, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 25, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-713-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2152957 filed by Sandra Petalas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service of Summons)(Iacopino, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petalas v. Hampstead Outlook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Petalas
Represented By: Michael J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampstead Outlook, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?