Pilotte v. Berlin Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Pilotte
Defendant: Berlin Police Department and Phillip Pelletier
Case Number: 1:2021cv00749
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Notice as to All Defendants filed by Alfred Pilotte. Served/Mailed on 9/24/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/15/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carr, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2021: #2 pdf text searchable affidavit, #3 Exhibit pdf text searchable exhibits) (jb).
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Phillip Pelletier. Affidavit of Service due on 11/12/2021.(jb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Phillip Pelletier Return of Service by Alfred Pilotte. Served/Mailed on 9/24/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/15/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carr, Anthony)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued electronically as to Phillip Pelletier. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Alfred Pilotte(Carr, Anthony)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Berlin Police Department Executed Waiver of Service by Alfred Pilotte. Served/Mailed on 9/17/2021. Answer Follow Up on 11/19/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carr, Anthony)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Berlin Police Department, Phillip Pelletier. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 7, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-749-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2156962 filed by Alfred Pilotte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to PD, #3 Notice to Pelletier, #4 Waiver for PD, #5 Waiver for Pelletier)(Carr, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilotte v. Berlin Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Pilotte
Represented By: Anthony Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlin Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Pelletier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?