Ocado Innovation Ltd. et al v. AutoStore AS et al
Plaintiff: Ocado Innovation Ltd. and Ocado Solutions Ltd.
Defendant: AutoStore AS and AutoStore System Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00806
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by AutoStore AS disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Devonshire, Bryanna)
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #9 Notice (Other), Notice of Refiling Waivers of Service filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email String Regarding Service)(Quillen, Henry)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of AutoStore AS, AutoStore System Inc. Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party AutoStore AS(pty:dft), Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Lucic, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement by AutoStore System Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Devonshire, Bryanna)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by AutoStore AS disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Devonshire, Bryanna)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AutoStore System Inc. by AutoStore System Inc.. Served/Mailed on 10/11/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/13/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Devonshire, Bryanna)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AutoStore AS by AutoStore AS. Served/Mailed on 10/11/2021. Answer Follow Up on 1/12/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Devonshire, Bryanna)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Refiling of Waivers of Service by AutoStore AS, AutoStore System Inc.. Attorney Bryanna Kleber Devonshire added to party AutoStore AS(pty:dft), Attorney Bryanna Kleber Devonshire added to party AutoStore System Inc.(pty:dft).(Devonshire, Bryanna)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint as to AutoStore System Inc. filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. Served/Mailed on 10/15/2021. Answer Follow Up on 11/5/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Quillen, Henry)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(ed)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses issued electronically as to AutoStore AS, AutoStore System Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ed)
October 13, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 WITHDRAWN, SEE DOC. NO. 5 . NOTICE of Withdrawal of Filing Waivers of Service Doc. Nos. 3 and 4 by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd..(Quillen, Henry) Modified on 10/14/2021 to add: withdrawn docket text (ko).
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AutoStore System Inc. by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. Served/Mailed on 10/11/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/13/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Quillen, Henry)
October 11, 2021 Filing 3 WITHDRAWN, SEE DOC. NO. #5 . WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AutoStore AS by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. Served/Mailed on 10/11/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/13/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Quillen, Henry) Modified on 10/14/2021 to add: withdrawn docket text (ko).
October 6, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-806-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Quillen, Henry)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2168515 filed by Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ocado Annual Report 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 19, 2018 Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Apr. 14, 2021 Press Release, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mar. 19, 2019 Press Release, #5 Exhibit 5 - Feb. 19, 2019 Press Release, #6 Exhibit 6 - July 11, 2019 Press Release, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sept. 12, 2019 Press Release, #8 Exhibit 8 - Nov. 14, 2019 Press Release, #9 Exhibit 9 - Jan. 23, 2020 Press Release, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 11,079,770, #11 Exhibit 11 - June 5, 2020 Press Release, #12 Exhibit 12 - Sept. 28, 2020 Press Release, #13 Exhibit 13 - Jan. 22, 2021 Press Release, #14 Exhibit 14 - Sept. 28, 2021 FT Article, #15 Exhibit 15 - AutoStore MHPN Reader's Choice Product, #16 Exhibit 16 - Black Line - Your Questions Answered, #17 Exhibit 17 - AutoStore Introduces Router, #18 Exhibit 18 - AutoStore Grid, #19 Exhibit 19 - AutoStore Bins, #20 Exhibit 20 - AutoStore Controller, #21 Exhibit 21 - AutoStore Robots FAQ, #22 Exhibit 22 - AutoStore Controller FAQ, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons - Waiver Summons Autostore AS, #25 Summons - Waiver Summons AutoStore System Inc.)(Quillen, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocado Innovation Ltd. et al v. AutoStore AS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocado Innovation Ltd.
Represented By: Henry Clay Quillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocado Solutions Ltd.
Represented By: Henry Clay Quillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoStore AS
Represented By: Bryanna Kleber Devonshire
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoStore System Inc.
Represented By: Bryanna Kleber Devonshire
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?