The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc. v. Houston Casualty Company
Plaintiff: The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc.
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00970
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Houston Casualty Company by The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 11/19/2021. Answer Follow Up on 1/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Burrows, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burrows, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons and Waiver issued electronically as to Houston Casualty Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
November 18, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
November 18, 2021 NOTICE re #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by November 29, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 11/29/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
November 17, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-970-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2185544 filed by The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HCC Quote and Specimen Policy, #2 Exhibit B - HCC Binder, #3 Exhibit C - HCC Policy, #4 Exhibit D - November 9, 2021 Letter from HCC, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Waiver Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #7 Summons - Waiver Waiver of the Service of Summons, #8 Exhibit Summons)(Burrows, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc. v. Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The International Association of Privacy Professionals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?