Ladd v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Ladd
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular Sales, LLC. and Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01051
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by All Defendants. Attorney Caroline NJ. Power added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline NJ. Power added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 1/11/2022. Answer Follow Up on 3/15/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Power, Caroline)
December 21, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 10, 2021 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-1051-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2194254 filed by Charlotte Ladd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladd v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Ladd
Represented By: Caroline U. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Caroline NJ. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular Sales, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Caroline NJ. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?