Zagami v. The Cheshire Medical Center
Plaintiff: Jeanne Zagami
Defendant: The Cheshire Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Cheshire Medical Center by Jeanne Zagami. Served/Mailed on 1/21/2022.(Varraso, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin J. Wyatt on behalf of Jeanne Zagami Attorney Benjamin J. Wyatt added to party Jeanne Zagami(pty:pla).(Wyatt, Benjamin)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. Case to be reassigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 6, 2022 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Reason for Reassignment: JL recused. The new case designation is: 22-cv-00002-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (jb)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to The Cheshire Medical Center. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
January 5, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 4, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-02-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2201668 filed by Jeanne Zagami. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Varraso, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zagami v. The Cheshire Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Zagami
Represented By: Michael Varraso
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheshire Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?