Larivee v. Hogan
Plaintiff: Robert Larivee
Defendant: Corey Hogan and Cory Hogan
Case Number: 1:2022cv00015
Filed: January 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving in part #15 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order with the following modifications: Trial scheduled for the two week period beginning March 7, 2023. Motions to dismiss due May 31, 2022. Summary Judgment motions due November 7, 2022. The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 28, 2022 is cancelled. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (js)
February 28, 2022 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/7/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 2/6/2023. JERS Statement due 2/6/2023. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/20/2023. (js)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Assented to Motion for Thomas J. Sherrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
February 24, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Cory Hogan. (Connor, Doreen)
February 23, 2022 Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/24/2022.(js)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Thomas J. Sherrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2218867.) filed by Robert Larivee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Vitt, Geoffrey)
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey J. Vitt on behalf of Robert Larivee Attorney Geoffrey J. Vitt added to party Robert Larivee(pty:pla).(Vitt, Geoffrey)
January 24, 2022 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE for 2/28/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/22/2022. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
January 21, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Thomas J. Sherrer, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 2/22/2022.(mc)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Corey Hogan.(Connor, Doreen)
January 15, 2022 Filing 12 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 2/14/2022.(mc)
January 15, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-15-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 15, 2022 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Vermont; Case Number: 2:21-cv-00191. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. No opposition filed. The parties agree that this court lacks personal jurisdiction over Defendant and Plaintiff consents to the transfer of this case to the District of New Hampshire. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/4/2022. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire filed by Robert Larivee. (same documents as #7 ).(kp) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Larivee. (same document as #8 ).(Sherrer, Thomas) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Corey Hogan.(Connor, Doreen) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 the Complaint. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/29/2021. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Corey Hogan.(Connor, Doreen) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Doreen F. Connor, Esq on behalf of Corey Hogan.(Connor, Doreen) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
October 11, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Robert Larivee. Corey Hogan served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021(Sherrer, Thomas) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
September 27, 2021 ISSUED Summons as to Corey Hogan. (eh) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corey Hogan filed by Robert Larivee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp) [Transferred from vtd on 1/15/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larivee v. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Larivee
Represented By: Thomas J. Sherrer
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Hogan
Represented By: Doreen F. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Hogan
Represented By: Doreen F. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?