Lemon v. Elliot Health System
Plaintiff: Charles Lemon
Defendant: Elliot Health System
Case Number: 1:2022cv00017
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (ADA 1990)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 ///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to case by Elliot Health System(Scott, K.)
November 2, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (lw)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #9 Notice of Settlement. Text of Order: Reviewed. The parties shall file an agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of by November 3, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (Case Settlement Deadline 11/3/2022. )(lw)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Elliot Health System(Scott, K.)
October 3, 2022 Clerk's Notice - No Joint Mediation Statement Filed. The parties are directed to file a Joint Mediation Statement within 14 days of this notice. Joint Mediation Follow Up on 10/17/2022.(lw)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound)(lw)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Joint Assented to Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted; the proposed order is adopted as an order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Joint Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by Elliot Health System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Prendergast, John)
April 5, 2022 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 3/17/2023. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/31/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2023 03:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/18/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #6 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 4/18/23. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/21/2022. Joint Statement re: Mediation Follow Up on 10/1/2022. Discovery deadline 11/15/2022. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/19/2022. (lw)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Elliot Health System. (Scott, K.)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Elliot Health System disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Scott, K.)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Prendergast on behalf of Elliot Health System Attorney John Prendergast added to party Elliot Health System(pty:dft).(Prendergast, John)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Elliot Health System.(Scott, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2022: #1 Dated Answer) (ko).
March 22, 2022 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 4/21/2022. (ko)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Elliot Health System. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
January 21, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 20, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-17-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2207725 filed by Charles Lemon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Major, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemon v. Elliot Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lemon
Represented By: Jason R.L. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Health System
Represented By: John Prendergast
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?