Holloway v. NH State Prison, Warden
Petitioner: Dale E. Holloway, Jr.
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Case Number: 1:2022cv00022
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Custodial Institution (DUPLICATE) by Dale E. Holloway, Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ed)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate filed by Dale E. Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Custodial) (ed)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk of Court from Dale E. Holloway, Jr. re: Copies (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ed)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Dale E. Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (ed)
February 23, 2022 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. New case number is 1:22-cv-22-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 4/4/2022. (ed)
February 3, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241. filed by Dale E. Holloway, Jr.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 2)(ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. NH State Prison, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale E. Holloway, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?