Adams et al v. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Debra M Adams, Danillie L Mars, Michelle L Miller, Anita W Dame, Debra M. Adams, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller and Anita W. Dame
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic and John Does 1-30
Case Number: 1:2022cv00099
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Jed W. Glickstein, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # BNHDC-2249726.) filed by Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Jed W. Glickstein, Esq.)(Mahan, Kathleen)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for E. Brantley Webb, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2249718.) filed by Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of E. Brantley Webb)(Mahan, Kathleen)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Nancy G. Ross, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2249700.) filed by Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Nancy G. Ross, Esq.)(Mahan, Kathleen)
May 16, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #17 Assented to MOTION for Jed W. Glickstein, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #15 Assented to MOTION for Nancy G. Ross, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ,Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, #16 Assented to MOTION for E. Brantley Webb, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(vln)
May 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Miville Deschenes on behalf of Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic Attorney Daniel Miville Deschenes added to party Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Miville Deschenes added to party Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Miville Deschenes added to party Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic(pty:dft).(Deschenes, Daniel)
May 3, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen M. Mahan on behalf of Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic Attorney Kathleen M. Mahan added to party Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen M. Mahan added to party Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen M. Mahan added to party Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic(pty:dft).(Mahan, Kathleen)
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic by Michelle L. Miller, Danillie L. Mars, Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame. Served/Mailed on 3/29/2022. Answer Follow Up on 5/31/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gyandoh, Mark)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic by Michelle L. Miller, Danillie L. Mars, Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame. Served/Mailed on 3/29/2022. Answer Follow Up on 5/31/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gyandoh, Mark)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic by Michelle L. Miller, Danillie L. Mars, Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame. Served/Mailed on 3/29/2022. Answer Follow Up on 5/31/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gyandoh, Mark)
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald Reavey on behalf of Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller Attorney Donald Reavey added to party Debra M. Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Reavey added to party Anita W. Dame(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Reavey added to party Danillie L. Mars(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Reavey added to party Michelle L. Miller(pty:pla).(Reavey, Donald)
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Gyandoh on behalf of Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller Attorney Mark Gyandoh added to party Debra M. Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Gyandoh added to party Anita W. Dame(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Gyandoh added to party Danillie L. Mars(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Gyandoh added to party Michelle L. Miller(pty:pla).(Gyandoh, Mark)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bt)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2231917.) filed by Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller.Follow up on Objection on 4/12/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit), #2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)(Gawryl, Janine)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabrielle Kelerchian on behalf of Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller Attorney Gabrielle Kelerchian added to party Debra M. Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Gabrielle Kelerchian added to party Anita W. Dame(pty:pla), Attorney Gabrielle Kelerchian added to party Danillie L. Mars(pty:pla), Attorney Gabrielle Kelerchian added to party Michelle L. Miller(pty:pla).(Kelerchian, Gabrielle)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bt)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bt)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2230509.) filed by Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller.Follow up on Objection on 4/7/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit), #2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificate Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Gawryl, Janine)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Donald R. Reavy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2230497.) filed by Debra M. Adams, Anita W. Dame, Danillie L. Mars, Michelle L. Miller.Follow up on Objection on 4/7/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit), #2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificate Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Gawryl, Janine)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic, Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic, Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(mc)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (mc)
March 23, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 18, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-99-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2228591 filed by Anita W Dame, Debra M Adams, Michelle L Miller, Danillie L Mars. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Gawryl, Janine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra M Adams
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danillie L Mars
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Miller
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita W Dame
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra M. Adams
Represented By: Mark Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danillie L. Mars
Represented By: Mark Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Miller
Represented By: Mark Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita W. Dame
Represented By: Mark Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: Janine Gawryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic
Represented By: Daniel Miville Deschenes
Represented By: Kathleen M. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic
Represented By: Daniel Miville Deschenes
Represented By: Kathleen M. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Investment Oversight Committee of Dartmouth-Hitchcock Clinic
Represented By: Daniel Miville Deschenes
Represented By: Kathleen M. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?