Thompson v. Howry et al
Plaintiff: Cappi Thompson
Defendant: Zachary J Howry, Donald R Gendron, William S. Daisey and City of Berlin
Case Number: 1:2022cv00151
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zachary J Howry by Cappi Thompson. Served/Mailed on 5/6/2022. Answer Follow Up on 7/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Jacob, Devon)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donald R Gendron by Cappi Thompson. Served/Mailed on 5/6/2022. Answer Follow Up on 7/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Jacob, Devon)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William S. Daisey by Cappi Thompson. Served/Mailed on 5/6/2022. Answer Follow Up on 7/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Jacob, Devon)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Berlin by Cappi Thompson. Served/Mailed on 5/6/2022. Answer Follow Up on 7/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Jacob, Devon)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Devon M. Jacob on behalf of Cappi Thompson Attorney Devon M. Jacob added to party Cappi Thompson(pty:pla).(Jacob, Devon)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion for Devon M. Jacob to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(cmp)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons(es) issued electronically as to City of Berlin, William S. Daisey, Donald R Gendron, Zachary J Howry. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons(es) and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Notice ECF)(cmp)
May 4, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (cmp)
May 3, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-151-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (cmp)
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Devon M. Jacob to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2245019.) filed by Cappi Thompson.Follow up on Objection on 5/17/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Devon M. Jacob)(Vogelman, Lawrence)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2245005 filed by Cappi Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cove rSheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Summons Howry, #3 Summons - Waiver Summons Daisey, #4 Summons - Waiver Summons Gendron, #5 Summons - Waiver Summons City of Berlin)(Vogelman, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Howry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cappi Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Devon M. Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary J Howry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R Gendron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Daisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?