Central Mutual Insurance Company v. SoClean Inc.
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00192
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Central Mutual Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Bosse, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Clerk's Notice - No DISCLOSURE Statement Filed. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file a DISCLOSURE statement within 24 hours of this notice. DISCLOSURE STATEMENT due by 6/10/2022.(vln)
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) issued electronically as to SoClean, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons(es) and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(cmp)
June 1, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. Central Mutual Insurance Company must file a Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Disclosure Statement due 6/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Compliance Deadline set for 6/8/2022.(cmp)
June 1, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (cmp)
May 31, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-192-SE. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (cmp)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2254974 filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bosse, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2022: #7 Summons - Waiver) (cmp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Mutual Insurance Company v. SoClean Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter L. Bosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?