Farmer v. USA
Petitioner: Anthony Farmer
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00203
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Text of Order: Anthony Farmer, an indigent incarcerated man, petitions to vacate his sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255. He asks the court to appoint counsel to represent him in this matter. Doc. no. 2. As grounds, he states that he pleaded guilty to a count of using a firearm in furtherance of a crime of violence under 18 U.S.C. 924(c) and that the predicate crime is no longer a crime of violence under Borden v. United States, 141 S. Ct. 1817 (2021). The court does not find that the interests of justice require appointing counsel at this time. See18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B) (standard for appointment of a counsel for a financially eligible person seeking relief under 2255 is if the interests of justice so require). Doc. no. 2 is denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 re #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255 filed by Anthony Farmer. Related document: #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255 filed by Anthony Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(de)
June 7, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
June 6, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-203-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 6, 2022 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)
May 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Anthony Farmer.(mc)
May 15, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255 filed by Anthony Farmer. Notice of Filing to US Attorney with copy of the motion. See also Criminal Case No. 1:17-cr-153-LM-01. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?