Whitfield v. US Social Security, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Kristine Whitfield
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration and US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Not Classified By Court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00280
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to US Social Security Administration, Commissioner by Kristine Whitfield. Served/Mailed on 8/3/2022. Answer Follow Up on 10/5/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Tillinghast, D.) Modified on 8/15/2022 to change answer deadline: (jb).
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(cmp)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (bf)
July 29, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (cmp)
July 27, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-280-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (cmp)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Kristine Whitfield.Follow up on Objection on 8/10/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tillinghast, D.)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Kristine Whitfield. SSA Record Due 9/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Tillinghast, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. US Social Security, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Whitfield
Represented By: D. Lance Tillinghast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?