Markos v. Great American Bike Tours, LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Lamont Markos
Defendant: Great American Bike Tours, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00307
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand as to Great American Bike Tours, LLC filed by Steven Lamont Markos. Served/Mailed on 9/30/2022. Answer Follow Up on 10/21/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parker, Robert)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Great American Bike Tours, LLC(kad)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Great American Bike Tours, LLC by Steven Lamont Markos. Served/Mailed on 8/23/2022. Answer Follow Up on 9/13/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parker, Robert)
September 4, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Great American Bike Tours, LLC by Steven Lamont Markos. Served/Mailed on 8/23/2022. Answer Follow Up on 9/13/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Parker, Robert)
August 9, 2022 Filing 4 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC.(mc)
August 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Great American Bike Tours, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
August 9, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 9/26/2022.(mc)
August 5, 2022 Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-307-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2278737 filed by Steven Lamont Markos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- USCO Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Order Summons)(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markos v. Great American Bike Tours, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lamont Markos
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Bike Tours, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?