Flores v. NH, State of et al
Petitioner: Jimmy M. Flores
Respondent: NH, State of and Hillsborough County Attorney's Office
Not Classified By Court: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00328
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Appointment of Counsel filed by Jimmy M. Flores. Served on 1/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb)
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 Request for a Lawyer filed by Jimmy M. Flores. Served on 1/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 Addendum/ to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jimmy M. Flores. (Attachments: #1 Envelope and cover letter)(jb)
November 21, 2022 Case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. New case number is 1:22-cv-328-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk, US District Court from Jimmy Flores re: Status (ed)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with INCOMPLETE Custodial Certificate filed by Jimmy M. Flores. (Attachments: #1 INCOMPLETE Certificate of Custodial)(ed)
October 28, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk from Jimmy Flores re: IFP Motion Deadline. (mc)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 11/21/2022. (mc)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Prohibiting Remote Electronic Access #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (mc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/21/2022) (mc).
September 21, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Waive all fees filed by Jimmy M. Flores.(mc)
August 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by Jimmy M. Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Petition)(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. NH, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy M. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hillsborough County Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?