Stan & Pete, Inc. et al v. Central Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stan & Pete, Inc. d/b/a Bow Recycling Center, Zero Waste & Recycling Services Inc. and Stan & Pete, Inc. doing business as Bow Recycling Center
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00374
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Reason for Reassignment: Magistrate Judge Johnstone is recused. The new case designation is: 22-cv-374-JL. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone recused. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
October 24, 2022 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Assented to MOTION to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. The case is stayed for 90 days. The 11/21/2022 pretrial conference is cancelled. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
October 24, 2022 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Stay filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay)(Antonellis, Anthony)
October 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 11/14/2022.(js)
October 24, 2022 Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Barbadoro Recused. The new case designation is: 22-cv-374-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (js)
October 24, 2022 RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2022 11:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/14/2022. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul J. Barbadoro recused. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Antonellis on behalf of Central Mutual Insurance Company Attorney Michael S. Antonellis added to party Central Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Antonellis, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Stan & Pete, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. This document replaces Document Number 9. (Eck, Jonathan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Zero Waste & Recycling Services Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Eck, Jonathan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 9 REFILED. SEE DOC. NO. 11 Disclosure Statement by Stan & Pete, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Eck, Jonathan) Modified on 10/11/2022 to add Refiled text (js).
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Eck on behalf of Stan & Pete, Inc., Zero Waste & Recycling Services Inc. (Eck, Jonathan)
October 4, 2022 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to MOTION for Michael S. Antonellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Michael S. Antonellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2297074.) filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Michael S. Antonellis, Esq.)(Antonellis, Anthony)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2022-CV-00882, Merrimack County Superior Court(Antonellis, Anthony)
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company.(Antonellis, Anthony)
September 26, 2022 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE for 11/14/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/7/2022. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
September 21, 2022 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Stan & Pete, Inc., and Zero Waste & Recycling Services Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by October 12, 2022. Disclosure Statement due 10/12/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
September 21, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
September 20, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-374-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Central Mutual Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Howard, Alexandra)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra B. Howard on behalf of Central Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Appearance of Anthony J. Antonellis (Howard, Alexandra)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra B. Howard on behalf of Central Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Appearance of Alexandra B. Howard (Howard, Alexandra)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Merrimack Superior Court - Northern District, case number 217-2022-CV-00882 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2293365) filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 10/11/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Superior Court Acceptance of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court)(Howard, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stan & Pete, Inc. et al v. Central Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan & Pete, Inc. d/b/a Bow Recycling Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Waste & Recycling Services Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan & Pete, Inc. doing business as Bow Recycling Center
Represented By: Jonathan Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexandra B. Howard
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Antonellis
Represented By: Michael S. Antonellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?