Crocco v. USA
Petitioner: Joseph Crocco
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00398
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE held via video-conference on 11/4/2022. Parties to file a motion as outlined. (Pltfs Atty: Nicholas C. Howie) (Defts Atty: Charles L. Rombeau)(Total Hearing Time: 9 minutes)(CJA Time: 14 minutes) (jb)
November 3, 2022 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing (time change only). In Chambers Conference reset for 11/4/2022 at 09:00 AM (from 10:00 AM) before Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 1, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing. In Chambers Conference set via video-conference for 11/3/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 1, 2022 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing (date change). In Chambers Conference via video-conference set for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED Order Appointing Counsel. Appointment of Attorney Nicholas C. Howie for Joseph Crocco for 2255 case. Assignment accepted on 10/21/2022. Text of Order: Nicholas C. Howie is hereby appointed as counsel in this case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel for 2255. Text of Order: Granted. After appointment, counsel shall confer with the USAO on the case and promptly arrange for a brief conference with the court (video or in-person based on counsel's preference and convenience). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L. Rombeau on behalf of USA Attorney Charles L. Rombeau added to party USA(pty:res).(Rombeau, Charles)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. Government to file an answer within sixty (60) days or a motion to dismiss within thirty (30) days as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 4, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255 filed by Joseph Crocco. Notice of Filing to US Attorney with copy of the motion. See also Criminal Case No. 1:18-cr-37-JL-01. (mc)
October 3, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-398-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 3, 2022 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crocco v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Crocco
Represented By: Nicholas C. Howie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Charles L. Rombeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?