The North Face Apparel Corp. et al v. EisaBooks Inc.
Plaintiff: The North Face Apparel Corp., Vans, Inc., TBL Licensing LLC, Altra, LLC and W-D Apparel Company, LLC
Defendant: EisaBooks Inc. doing business as JMEGoods
Case Number: 1:2022cv00434
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 9, 2023 filed by EisaBooks Inc..(Hewitt, Casey)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 9, 2023. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by EisaBooks Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hewitt, Casey)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Hewitt on behalf of EisaBooks Inc. Attorney Casey Hewitt added to party EisaBooks Inc.(pty:dft).(Hewitt, Casey)
November 30, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Affidavit of Service, filed by The North Face Apparel Corp., Vans, Inc., Altra, LLC, W-D Apparel Company, LLC, TBL Licensing LLC. No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE.(js)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to EisaBooks Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 11/18/2022. Answer Follow Up on 12/9/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Valente, Christopher)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(mc)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to EisaBooks Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 27, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 26, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-434-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Altra, LLC, TBL Licensing LLC, The North Face Apparel Corp., Vans, Inc., W-D Apparel Company, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Valente, Christopher)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2306621 filed by The North Face Apparel Corp., Altra, LLC, TBL Licensing LLC, Vans, Inc., W-D Apparel Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Valente, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The North Face Apparel Corp. et al v. EisaBooks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The North Face Apparel Corp.
Represented By: Christopher J. Valente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vans, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Valente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBL Licensing LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Valente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altra, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Valente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W-D Apparel Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Valente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EisaBooks Inc. doing business as JMEGoods
Represented By: Casey Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?