Maragh v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Marcus Maragh
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2022cv00566
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Referring Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #10 Order, Endorsed Order. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (kad)
January 24, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: On January 20, 2023, the Court issued an order in this case directing that the petitioner be immediately released from the custody of the Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP). As the petitioner has now been released from BOP custody, the petition in this case is dismissed as moot. See Ford v. Bender, 768 F.3d 15, 29 (1st Cir. 2014) ("A prisoner's challenge to prison conditions or policies is generally rendered moot by his transfer or release."). The Clerk's office is directed to close this case and enter judgment. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
January 24, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Summary Judgment. Text of Order: Denied as moot. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
January 20, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 1/20/2023. The parties consented to the assignment of this case to the magistrate judge. Evidence introduced. The court ordered petitioner immediately released from BOP custody to begin his term of supervised release. (Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Pltfs Atty: Marcus Maragh) (Defts Atty: Heather Cherniske)(Total Hearing Time: 13 min.) (kad)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Court therefore orders that Mr. Maragh be immediately released from BOP custody to begin his term of supervised release in the Eastern District of New York. It is the Court's understanding that, upon his release from BOP custody, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) will take Mr. Maragh into its custody pursuant to an immigration detainer. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
January 20, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (vln)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER OF REFERENCE re: #9 Consent - Magistrate Judge Assignment. It is ordered that this case be referred to a United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73. The new case designation is: 22-cv-566-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
January 18, 2023 Notice regarding #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this motion has been referred to Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone for proposed findings of fact and a recommendation as to its disposition. Any such findings and recommendations shall be filed with the Court and a copy shall forthwith be served on all parties. (vln)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Transport Marcus Maragh on January 20, 2023 for Show Cause from FCI Berlin. ORDER Signed by Deputy Clerk. (vln)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/20/2023 09:00 AM via ZOOM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(vln)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE Regarding Summary Judgment. (vln)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FCI Berlin, Warden. Attorney Heather A Cherniske added to party FCI Berlin, Warden(pty:res).Follow up on Objection on 2/13/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A-Rouleau declaration, #3 Attachment to Exhibit 1-Sentence Computation, #4 Attachment to Exhibit 2-Admission Release History, #5 Attachment to Exhibit 3-Detainer, #6 Attachment to Exhibit 4-Program Statement 5410.01)(Cherniske, Heather)
January 9, 2023 Filing Fee paid: $ 5 (Credit Card), receipt number 297 by Marcus Maragh re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241. (mc)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden by Marcus Maragh. Served/Mailed on 1/3/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/24/2023. (vln)
December 29, 2022 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to FCI Berlin, Warden per #3 Order Directing Service.(vln)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(vln)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 2/28/2023. (ed)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 Emergency Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241. filed by Marcus Maragh. (ed)
December 28, 2022 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(ed)
December 28, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
December 28, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-566-SE. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maragh v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Maragh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Represented By: Heather A Cherniske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?